California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015