Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1817.) | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |