California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1207 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 10, 2015