Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1595.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|