California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 18, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 30, 2015

Amended

Bill May 7, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015