California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015