California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015