|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2016
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4729.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1263.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|