Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2742.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b) . From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1016.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|