California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1250 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/19/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1250AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bloom FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 35554 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1250, as amended, Bloom. Vehicles: buses: gross axle weight. Existing law, operative January 1, 2016,  and subject to exception for certain transit buses,  provides that the gross weight on any one axle of a bus shall not exceed 20,500 pounds.  Existing law exempts from this limitation a transit bus procured through a solicitation process pursuant to which a solicitation was issued before January 1, 2013. A violation of this provision is a crime.   This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes to those provisions.   This bill would exempt from the weight limitation transit buses procured through a solicitation process pursuant to which a solicitation was issued before January 1, 2016.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 35554 of the Vehicle Code, as amended by Section 2 of Chapter 263 of the Statutes of 2014, is amended to read: 35554. (a) (1) Notwithstanding Section 35550, the maximum gross weight on any one axle of a bus shall not exceed 20,500 pounds. (2) This subdivision does not apply to a transit bus procured through a solicitation process pursuant to which a solicitation was issued before January 1,  2013.   2016.  (b) A transit bus is not subject to Section 35550.