California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1258 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015