|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 599, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 30. Page 3150.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2704.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 1858.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|