LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1267
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1267
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1267
Compare Versions
AB1267 Chaptered August 13, 2015
AB1267 Enrolled July 8, 2015
AB1267 Amended April 27, 2015
AB1267 Amended April 20, 2015
AB1267 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1267 Chaptered August 13, 2015
AB1267 Enrolled July 8, 2015
AB1267 Amended April 27, 2015
AB1267 Amended April 20, 2015
AB1267 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare