Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1582.) | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |