California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill March 26, 2015