Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2016 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2016 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2015 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.) | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |