California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1279 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill May 27, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015