Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 1342.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 5). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |