California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1285 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1285INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Thurmond FEBRUARY 27, 2015 An act to amend Section 4659 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1285, as introduced, Thurmond. Developmental services: regional centers. Existing law, the Lanterman Developmental Disabilities Services Act, requires the State Department of Developmental Services to contract with regional centers to provide services and supports to individuals with developmental disabilities and their families, and requires regional centers to identify and pursue all possible sources of funding for consumers receiving those services. This bill would make technical, nonsubstantive changes to those provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4659 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is amended to read: 4659. (a) Except as otherwise provided in subdivision (b) or (e), the regional center shall identify and pursue all possible sources of funding for consumers receiving regional center services. These sources shall include, but not be limited to, both of the following: (1) Governmental or other entities or programs required to provide or pay the cost of providing services, including Medi-Cal, Medicare, the Civilian Health and Medical Program for Uniform Services, school districts, and federal supplemental security income and the state supplementary program. (2) Private entities, to the maximum extent they are liable for the cost of services, aid, insurance, or medical assistance to the consumer. (b) Any revenues collected by a regional center pursuant to this section shall be applied against the cost of services prior to use of regional center funds for those services. This revenue shall not result in a reduction in the regional center's purchase of services budget, except as it relates to federal supplemental security income and the state supplementary program. (c) Effective July 1, 2009, notwithstanding any other law or regulation, regional centers shall not purchase any service that would otherwise be available from Medi-Cal, Medicare, the Civilian Health and Medical Program for Uniform Services, In-Home Support Services, California Children's Services, private insurance, or a health care service plan when a consumer or a    consumer's  family meets the criteria of this coverage but chooses not to pursue that coverage. If, on July 1, 2009, a regional center is purchasing that service as part of a consumer's individual program plan (IPP), the prohibition shall take effect on October 1, 2009. (d) (1) Effective July 1, 2009, notwithstanding any other law or regulation, a regional center shall not purchase medical or dental services for a consumer three years of age or older unless the regional center is provided with documentation of a Medi-Cal, private insurance, or a health care service plan denial and the regional center determines that an appeal by the consumer or  the consumer' s  family of the denial does not have merit. If, on July 1, 2009, a regional center is purchasing the service as part of a consumer's IPP, this provision shall take effect on August 1, 2009. Regional centers may pay for medical or dental services during the following periods: (A) While coverage is being pursued, but before a denial is made. (B) Pending a final administrative decision on the administrative appeal if the  consumer's  family has provided to the regional center a verification that an administrative appeal is being pursued. (C) Until the commencement of services by Medi-Cal, private insurance, or a health care service plan. (2) When necessary, the consumer or  the consumer's  family may receive assistance from the regional center, the Clients' Rights Advocate funded by the department, or the state council in pursuing these appeals. (e) This section shall not impose any additional liability on the parents of children with developmental disabilities, or to restrict eligibility for, or deny services to, any individual who qualifies for regional center services but is unable to pay. (f) In order to best utilize generic resources, federally funded programs, and private insurance programs for individuals with developmental disabilities, the department and regional centers shall engage in the following activities: (1) Within existing resources, the department shall provide training to regional centers, no less than once every two years, in the availability and requirements of generic, federally funded and private programs available to persons with developmental disabilities, including, but not limited to, eligibility requirements, the application process and covered services, and the appeal process. (2) Regional centers shall disseminate information and training to all service coordinators regarding the availability and requirements of generic, federally funded, and private insurance programs on the local level.