Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2015 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 648.) | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2015 | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2015 | Introduced. To print. |