|
08/17/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 223, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2316.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1784.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1381.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|