|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 750, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2613.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1226.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|