Assembly | 06/03/2015 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |