Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2015 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1913.). | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2015 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2015 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 3). | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A. | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | ||
Assembly | 12/01/2014 | Read first time. To print. |