California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1305 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015