LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1307
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1307
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1307
Compare Versions
AB1307 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB1307 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB1307 Amended September 3, 2015
AB1307 Amended August 18, 2015
AB1307 Amended July 7, 2015
AB1307 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1307 Amended April 23, 2015
AB1307 Amended April 14, 2015
AB1307 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1307 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1307 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB1307 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB1307 Amended September 3, 2015
AB1307 Amended August 18, 2015
AB1307 Amended July 7, 2015
AB1307 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1307 Amended April 23, 2015
AB1307 Amended April 14, 2015
AB1307 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1307 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare