|
10/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 527, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3069.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2634.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2155.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1596.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1134.) In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|