California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill April 15, 2015