California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1326 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015