Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |