California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1337 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 22, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015