|
09/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2119.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1434.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1380.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|