09/02/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 243, Statutes of 2015. | |||
09/02/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2116.). | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1565.) | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2015 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |