|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 705, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2914.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 5. Page 2395.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1476.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|