Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 6. Page 3053.) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 651.) | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2015 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2015 | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2015 | Introduced. To print. |