|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2562.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2117.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1442.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|