California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1351 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015