|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 21. Page 2775.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2296.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 16. Page 1439.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|