|
10/02/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2562.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2109.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1450.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|