Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and G.O. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3509.) | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2016 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |