California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 7, 2015