California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1373 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill September 2, 2015
Bill May 14, 2015