California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2015

Amended

Bill July 14, 2015
Bill June 11, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015