Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Beall.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 18. Page 1905.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|