California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1390 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill August 19, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill May 18, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015