Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Assembly Rule 78 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2938.) From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bonta.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 1883.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|