California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1399 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill June 9, 2016
Bill February 10, 2016
Bill January 13, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016