Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2015 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2015 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | ||
Assembly | 12/01/2014 | Read first time. To print. |