BILL NUMBER: AB 14AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 26, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 12, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Waldron ( Coauthor: Assembly Member Maienschein Coauthors: Assembly Members Brown and Maienschein ) ( Coauthor: Senator Nielsen ) DECEMBER 1, 2014 An act to add and repeal Title 24 (commencing with Section 110050) of the Government Code, relating to unmanned aircraft systems. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 14, as amended, Waldron. Unmanned aircraft systems: task force. Existing federal law, the Federal Aviation Administration Modernization and Reform Act of 2012, provides for the integration of civil unmanned aircraft systems, commonly known as drones, into the national airspace system by September 30, 2015. Existing federal law requires the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration to develop and implement operational and certification requirements for the operation of public unmanned aircraft systems in the national airspace system by December 31, 2015. This bill would create the Unmanned Aircraft Systems Task Force, comprised of 10 members, as provided. The bill would require the task force to research, develop, and formulate a comprehensive policy for unmanned aircraft systems. The task force would be required to submit, among other things, a policy draft and suggested legislation pertaining to unmanned aircraft systems to the Legislature and the Governor throughout the term of the task force, on or before January 1, 2018. The bill would provide that these provisions are repealed on January 1, 2022. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Title 24 (commencing with Section 110050) is added to the Government Code, to read: TITLE 24. Unmanned Aircraft Systems Task Force 110050. (a) The Legislature finds and declares that there is a need for California to have in place a comprehensive policy for the operation of unmanned aircraft systems, and a desire to work with the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) in the development of and within the guidelines of the FAA as they are put in place. (b) It is the intent of the Legislature in enacting this title that a task force be created to advise the Governor , the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, and the Legislature in formulating a comprehensive policy for the state regarding unmanned aircraft systems, including, but not limited to, operating as an ongoing working group reporting ongoing activity, commenting on FAA policy development, and anticipating and recognizing California's unique needs for high technology, aerospace, commercial, agricultural and public safety uses. 110051. (a) There is hereby created the Unmanned Aircraft Systems Task Force which shall operate for two years, until January 1, 2018. (b) The task force shall take all actions necessary to research, develop, and formulate a comprehensive policy for unmanned aircraft systems, to promote aviation, aerospace, agricultural, public safety and technology industry uses throughout the state, through the commercialization of aviation, aerospace, and technology products and ideas, including, but not limited to, all of the following: (1) Review regulations and guidance from the FAA regarding unmanned aircraft systems and incorporate them into a state policy draft and advise the Governor , the Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development, and the Legislature on an on-going basis regarding FAA policy development, task force activities, and public comment regarding the development of the FAA guidelines to coincide with the needs of California. (2) Provide written recommendations, together with suggested legislation, for a comprehensive state policy for unmanned aircraft systems that allows the use of unmanned aircraft systems for public and private applications. (3) Study the private use of unmanned aircraft systems to encourage development of the unmanned aircraft systems industry in the private sector. (4) Evaluate complaints and concerns that are expressed to the task force regarding the use of unmanned aircraft systems. (5) Study and make recommendations with respect to ensuring that unmanned aircraft systems users comply with applicable laws, and assess implementation plans and results. (6) Encourage communication and resource sharing among individuals and organizations involved in the aviation, aerospace, agriculture, government, and technology industry, including business, the military, and academia. 110052. (a) Any written recommendations, suggested legislation, or other drafts or documents required to be prepared pursuant to Section 110051 shall be submitted to the Legislature and the Governor throughout the term of the task force, on or before January 1, 2018. (b) The materials described in subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795. 110053. The task force shall consist of 10 members, as follows, who shall serve a two-year term: (a) The Adjutant General of the Military Department, or his or her designee, shall be an ex officio member of the task force. (b) Three members appointed by the Governor: (1) A member representing the California University System. (2) A member representing agriculture. (3) A member from the Governor's economic development group. (c) Three members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules: (1) A member representing the aerospace industry. (2) A member representing the Academy of Model Aeronautics. (3) A member representing law enforcement. (d) Three members appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly: (1) A member representing business and industry. (2) Two public members who have participated in the unmanned aircraft system industry and who have experience operating unmanned aircraft systems. 110054. (a) The task force may meet as frequently as necessary to carry out its responsibilities. (b) The members of the task force shall serve without compensation, but shall receive a per diem of one hundred dollars ($100) and reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses incurred in connection with the performance of their duties. 110055. The task force may appoint an executive director, who may employ staff upon approval by the task force. 110056. The task force shall be funded by an appropriation in the annual Budget Act. 110097. 110067. This title shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2022, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2022, deletes or extends that date.