California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1407 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill July 6, 2015
Bill May 21, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015